SHEFFIELD SCHOOLS CHRISTIAN WORKER TRUST

Charity number: 1007305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

CaSS is about making connections between church and school. It seeks to link together churches and schools in Sheffield and is interdenominational. CaSS recognises that schools are a vital part of our national life deserving the support of their local community. It has an interest in the well-being of the whole school community and encourages churches to be creatively involved with schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £23,665
Total expenditure: £22,741

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnsley
  • Derbyshire
  • Doncaster
  • Lincolnshire
  • Nottinghamshire
  • Rotherham
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 January 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CHRISTIANS AND SHEFFIELD SCHOOLS - C A S S (Working name)
  • CHRISTIANS AND SHEFFIELD SCHOOLS (CASS) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Chambers Trustee 17 March 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GABRIEL'S GREYSTONES, SHEFFIELD
Recently registered
Cherry Mair Trustee 18 November 2022
CHURCHES FOR YOUTH IN SHEFFIELD 17
Received: On time
Philippa Caroline Dand Trustee 24 November 2021
None on record
Alan Roger Nickless Trustee 23 January 2019
None on record
GLENN EVANS Trustee 01 September 2011
BENTS GREEN METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
RICHARD BRYAN DONKIN Trustee 12 March 2004
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £19.29k £22.27k £19.04k £21.12k £23.67k
Total expenditure £19.99k £19.63k £20.95k £20.59k £22.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 26 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bents Green Methodist Church
Ringinglow Road
Sheffield
S11 7PU
Phone:
07812 855 332