A G MANLY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary (but not exclusive) objective of the A G Manly Charitable Trust is to provide financial assistance to further the science of engineering for the benefit of the public and to advance education in engineering, especially to young people. The Trustees are unlikely to consider projects outside the south-east of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- East Sussex
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 January 1992: Standard registration
- A G MANLY TRUST (Working name)
- MANLY TRUST (Working name)
- THE MANLY TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID MICHAEL MANLY | Trustee | 19 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
EWEN PETER GAIR ROSE | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN MONTGOMERY | Trustee | 28 December 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.75k | £113.99k | £116.27k | £119.90k | £121.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.42k | £83.29k | £117.95k | £119.55k | £122.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 NOVEMBER 1991, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18 OCTOBER 2006.
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE SCIENCE OF ENGINEERING FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Moore Kingston Smith LLP
Betchworth House
57-65 Station Road
Redhill
RH1 1DL
- Phone:
- 01403 780852
- Email:
- manlytrust@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window