EAST YORKSHIRE LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Events, e.g. lectures; visits to houses, churches and other buildings of historic importance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 January 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARTHUR GRAVES CREDLAND | Chair |
|
||||||
Alan Steven Robert George | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Jean Dews | Trustee | 14 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Normington | Trustee | 30 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN BOWES | Trustee | 10 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Mike Rymer | Trustee | 17 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN GOOD | Trustee | 21 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Susan Barbara Wade | Trustee | 22 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joan Kemp | Trustee | 22 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH CARRICK | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BARNARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAMELA JOAN MARTIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.58k | £4.98k | £6.04k | £12.00k | £9.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.80k | £4.54k | £7.75k | £6.94k | £5.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 1971 AS AMENDED 23 MARCH 1991 AND 9 NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY FOSTERING THE STUDY OF LOCAL HISTORY AND DISSEMINATING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 The Meadows
Leven
BEVERLEY
East Yorkshire
HU17 5LX
- Phone:
- 01430422833
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window