NATHAN LASKI MEMORIAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing financial assistance to registered charities which advance Jewish education or support Jewish youth activities in the wider Jewish Community in Greater Manchester
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 January 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN PAUL DOVER | Chair | 07 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Abeles | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell Conn | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Chapman | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonny Wineberg | Trustee | 23 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Sharon Avril Bannister | Trustee | 23 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.36k | £19.64k | £6.24k | £7.19k | £6.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.75k | £12.20k | £18.35k | £6.80k | £6.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 5 MAY 1993.
Charitable objects
(1)THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY, AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY THEREOF, FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREATER MANCHESTER IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT: (A)THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, IMPOTENT AND POOR. (B)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. (C)THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (D)THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES. (2)THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY INCOME FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH APPLY OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR PART OF THEIR INCOME FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILL DICKINSON
50 FOUNTAIN STREET
MANCHESTER
M2 2AS
- Phone:
- 01618177200
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window