COMMUNITY RESOURCE SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Collection of waste resources from households and business to be reused/recycled, which then are offered to people of low income or on state benfit to improve quality of life and alleviation of poverty. Training and education support for people with special needs to assist in gaining employment or improve quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 10 January 1992: Standard registration
- 04 June 2015: Funds received from 257665 CARDIFF CALEDONIAN SOCIETY TRUST FUND
- 23 November 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- TRACK 2000 (Working name)
- TRACK 2000 COMMUNITY RESOURCE SERVICES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 30/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.09k | £1.12m | £3.94k | £392 | £138 | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.51k | £228.59k | £452.69k | £387.60k | £639.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £17.72k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £106.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £303 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £1.01m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £228.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 13 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 08 February 2019 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 30 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING OF PERSONS WITH A TRAINING NEED BY THE PROVISION OF SUITABLE FACILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PRACTICE BASIC AND MORE SPECIALISED SKILLS. 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF RENOVATED FURNITURE FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SOUTH GLAMORGAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window