Financial history DERBY HIGH SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1007348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £6.02m £6.27m £7.37m £8.49m £9.91m
Total expenditure £5.72m £5.76m £6.84m £7.74m £8.75m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £270.61k £125.19k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £294.41k £125.19k £0 £0 £428.87k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.57m £6.05m £7.24m £8.28m £9.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16.96k £16.49k £18.82k £58.35k £31.51k
Income - Other £137.58k £72.04k £116.79k £149.03k £152.47k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.68m £5.72m £6.80m £7.70m £8.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £41.60k £36.81k £46.85k £33.06k £41.35k
Expenditure - Governance £23.41k £17.43k £12.15k £12.70k £13.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0