VETA BAILEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides funding for the training of doctors and medical personnel in developing countries in Africa, Asia, Central America and South America
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bangladesh
- Bolivia
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Ethiopia
- Haiti
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Malawi
- Nepal
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- South Sudan
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Uganda
Governance
- 16 January 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Ruth Yates | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SAMUEL MILSON SEAGER | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEREK RICHARD ATKINS MA CANTAB | Trustee | 05 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr MADHURI GUPTA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.96k | £14.59k | £27.85k | £15.85k | £28.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.56k | £34.43k | £27.95k | £30.23k | £29.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH. JUNE 1981
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECT OR PURPOSE OR OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Jones Road
WARWICK
CV34 5JQ
- Phone:
- 01926 241898
- Email:
- vbaileyct@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window