ASSOCIATION FOR REHABILITATION OF COMMUNICATION AND ORAL SKILLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARCOS' overall objective is to improve the quality of life for people who have communication and/or swallowing difficulties, and of their carers and families. This involves the promotion and provision of specialist training, comprehensive therapy and suitable research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £102,193 from 7 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Germany
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 January 1992: Standard registration
- ARCOS (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kara Berry | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Wholey | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Clare Webb | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Ruth Maiden MBE | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Andrew Kelway Gurney | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Maurice Stanley | Trustee | 17 December 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.26k | £238.82k | £370.52k | £351.34k | £329.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £290.25k | £279.30k | £281.74k | £388.86k | £350.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £23.00k | £60.00k | £81.33k | £102.19k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £12.39k | £14.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 DECEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WHO HAVE COMMUNICATION DIFFICULTIES PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TREATMENT EDUCATION AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HATHERTON LODGE
AVENUE ROAD
MALVERN
WORCESTERSHIRE
WR14 3AG
- Phone:
- 01684576795
- Email:
- admin@arcos.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window