BROOKFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The parent teacher association of Brookfield Primary School. The purpose of Brookfield School Association is to advance the education of pupils in the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Camden
Governance
- 17 January 1992: Standard registration
- B S A (Working name)
- BROOKFIELD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (BSA) (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Agnes Leger | Chair | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stella Solomon | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Ragozhina | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Blyth | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.64k | £17.98k | £28.10k | £62.42k | £54.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.92k | £69.80k | £63.54k | £56.29k | £46.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 October 2023 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 October 2023 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 October 2022 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 October 2021 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 October 2021 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH DECEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED 27TH SEPTEMBER 2000 as amended on 13 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT BROOKFIELD SCHOOL
Area of benefit
HIGHGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brookfield Primary School
Chester Road
LONDON
N19 5DH
- Phone:
- 07752692126
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window