THE ASPEX VISUAL ARTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Art gallery and educational charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £147,069 from 4 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 27 January 1992: Standard registration
- ASPEX GALLERY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Dawn Langley | Chair | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Elise Phillips | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Panagiota Papadimitri | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Hull | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Loredana McCay | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clarke Stephen Reynolds | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Lee Ingles | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Romain-Leo Daniel Gerald Albert Burtin | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Mary Louise Turner | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Reah | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Barlow | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAXWELL CHARLES CRAFT | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £320.07k | £350.80k | £364.32k | £324.79k | £296.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £361.59k | £357.65k | £372.18k | £383.71k | £358.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.90k | £47.24k | £229.69k | £152.31k | £147.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 DECEMBER 1991, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 8 JUNE 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE,MAINTAIN,IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE VISUAL ARTS AND THE PROVISION OF STUDIOS AND OTHER PLACES WHERE THEY MAY BE PRACTISED AND WHERE ART AND ARTEFACTS MAY BE CREATED OR EXHIBITED WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS IN HAMPSHIRE AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VULCAN BUILDING
GUNWHARF QUAYS
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 3BF
- Phone:
- 02392778080
- Email:
- info@aspex.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window