STANDFORD,PASSFIELD AND HOLLYWATER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(A) To promote the benefit of all inhabitants of Standford, Passfield and Hollywater by associating together and with other organisations; (B) Provide facilities in the form of a community centre for education, recreation and leisure and to maintain and manage same.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 27 January 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RONALD Sergeant | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Jean Elizabeth Morgan | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Anne Motley | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £570 | £10.00k | £110 | £663 | £610 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07k | £4.65k | £807 | £1.30k | £1.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 August 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 03 August 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 September 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 September 2022 | 410 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 14 April 2021 | 258 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH. MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF STANDFORD,PASSFIELD AND HOLLYWATER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX,SEXUAL ORIENTATION,RACE OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES,VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B)TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE STANDFORD,PASSFIELD,HOLLYWATER
Contact information
- Address:
-
JERSEY COTTAGE
STANDFORD LANE
STANDFORD
BORDON
GU35 8QY
- Phone:
- 01428751326
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window