LEEDS MIND

Charity Number: 1007625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Aims to promote the preservation and safeguarding of mental health and the relief of persons suffering from mental health problems

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 1992: Standard registration
  • 09 December 2024: Funds received from 1194277 LEEDS BEREAVEMENT FORUM
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • LEEDS ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tracy Commons Trustee 13 May 2024
None on record
Caroline McGrath Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Heather Gibson-Simpson Trustee 21 April 2024
None on record
Blane Anthony Watson Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
Cheryl Astley Trustee 05 December 2022
None on record
Jennifer Murgatroyd Trustee 17 March 2022
None on record
Kathryn Lupton Trustee 09 December 2021
None on record
Luke Barrett Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.84m £2.85m £3.20m £3.54m £3.50m
Total expenditure £2.98m £2.84m £2.92m £3.49m £3.60m
Income from government contracts £2.06m £403.53k £366.74k £1.99m £2.64m
Income from government grants N/A £103.16k £35.04k £176.00k £181.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £540.24k £558.20k £444.61k £770.45k £741.33k
Income - Other trading activities £37.47k £8.32k £20.42k £22.80k £29.21k
Income - Charitable activities £2.25m £2.28m £2.73m £2.75m £2.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.01k £2.06k £1.59k £4.99k £1.40k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £170.80k £20.81k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.86m £2.74m £2.83m £3.29m £3.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £118.56k £105.16k £95.31k £197.78k £213.37k
Expenditure - Governance £52.79k £40.63k £37.46k £68.85k £28.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £433.79k £399.47k £382.31k £365.16k £348.00k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.19m £1.28m £1.48m £1.87m £1.66m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £333.29k £378.30k £292.27k £611.41k £478.15k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Mind
11 Clarence Road
Horsforth
LEEDS
LS18 4LB
Phone:
01133055800