THE COWLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes with an emphasis of giving grants to charities that (1) support underprivileged children, (2) provide welfare for animals and (3) undertake research into treatment for cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 January 1992: Standard registration
- 15 May 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £836 | £3.19k | £1 | £0 | £100.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.72k | £1.89k | £1.68k | £1.73k | £117.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 21 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 21 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 05 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 17 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 07 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9TH. AUGUST 1991
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT OR PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE SETTLOR DURING HER LIFETIME AND THEREAFTER THE TRUSTEES MAY IN HER OR THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window