Financial history COVENTRY PANAHGHAR PROJECT

Charity number: 1007676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £793.49k £1.33m £1.55m £1.96m £1.64m
Total expenditure £752.40k £1.00m £1.44m £2.08m £1.93m
Income from government contracts N/A £478.04k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £498.05k £853.58k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £465 £9.41k £21.80k £3.69k £2.79k
Income - Other trading activities £34.29k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £757.63k £1.32m £1.53m £1.96m £1.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.11k £838 £5 £703 £4.55k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.55k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £717.34k £994.23k £1.44m £2.08m £1.93m
Expenditure - Raising funds £35.06k £6.37k £0 £2.78k £2.93k
Expenditure - Governance £16.15k £24.73k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0