MORETON ROMANIAN ORPHANS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE A TWO WEEK HOLIDAY, WITH LOCAL HOST FAMILIES, FOR CHILDREN FROM THE AGES OF 8 YEARS TO 15 YEARS, FROM PLACEMENT CENTRES (FORMERLY ORPHANAGES) WHICH ARE RUN BY THE SOCIAL SERVICES DEPARTMENT IN ROMANIA. WHILST HERE, SOCIAL EVENTS, ENTERTAINMENT, AND EDUCATIONAL VISITS ARE ORGANISED FOR THEM TO ATTEND.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Romania
Governance
- 29 January 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Jackson | Chair | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dumitrescu Alexandru Viorel | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Saunders | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Menzies | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sadie Libby | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Travis Fleetwood | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Bratley | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amy Mirea | Trustee | 10 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
LEANNE WRATHALL | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.04k | £8.74k | £120 | £120 | £120 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.29k | £4.03k | £633 | £633 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 July 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 July 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH. DECEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS ESPECIALLY CHILDREN WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND IN PARTICULAR THE CITIZENS OF ROMANIA.
Area of benefit
ROMANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Barnard Close
Newport
SAFFRON WALDEN
Essex
CB11 3QE
- Phone:
- 07445180101
- Email:
- MROFcharity@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window