BASE 51

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Base 51 supports the holistic well-being of young people aged 11 to 25 through: Counselling, Safe Space : one to one support, advice and guidance, youth Groups, LGBTQ youth group :Outburst, Evolution: support for young people affected by serious violence, food, laundry and showers. Base 51 runs a professional training academy ( accredited) , and is based in NGY myplace centre in Nottingham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£649,738
Donations and legacies | £162.09k | |
Charitable activities | £487.49k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £158 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£811,360
Raising funds | £6.35k | |
Charitable activities | £805.01k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £275,885 from 5 government contract(s) and £78,727 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.35k | |
Charitable expenditure | £805.01k |
People

25 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 23 January 1992: Standard registration
- BASE 51 (Previous name)
- HINT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Johnston | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Dunn | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hipkiss | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shruti Trivedi | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Duckworth | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Luke Raddon Jackson | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Stevenson | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leah Binney | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Orozco | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
FAIZAH MARYAM MUSTAFA | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Bartley | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £611.13k | £681.47k | £671.91k | £537.11k | £649.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £515.59k | £557.37k | £634.65k | £682.62k | £811.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £129.56k | £158.13k | N/A | £275.89k | |
|
Income from government grants | £120.38k | £354.18k | £253.18k | N/A | £78.73k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £157.63k | £175.58k | £228.55k | £117.43k | £162.09k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £453.48k | £505.88k | £443.35k | £419.61k | £487.49k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £18 | £9 | £4 | £68 | £158 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £515.59k | £557.37k | £634.65k | £682.62k | £805.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.03k | £20.96k | £10.87k | £2.56k | £1.49k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £385.32k | £497.71k | £569.49k | £415.20k | £292.72k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £19.43k | £19.65k | £44.08k | £26.98k | £65.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/12/1991 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12/07/2011 as amended on 16 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
(1) To promote the preservation and protection of the physical and mental health of young persons between the ages of 11 and 25 in the City of Nottingham, Nottinghamshire and the East Midlands (2) To Advance the education of such young persons as aforesaid and to provide in the interests of social welfare facilities for their recreation or other leisure-time occupation
Area of benefit
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4A Peachey Street
Nottingham
NG1 4AN
- Phone:
- 01159525040
- Email:
- info@base51.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window