ARIHANT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1007733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO DONATE FUNDS TOWARDS HUMANITARIAN CAUSES AND ACTIVITIES INCLUDING COMMUNITY GROUPS.SUPPORTING PROJECTS OR APPEALS THAT MEETS THE NEEDS AND PROVIDE BENEFIT TO THE UNDER COMMUNITY. THE CHARITY ALSO CONSIDER THE WELL BEING OF ANIMALS OF PRIMARY IMPORTANCE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £35,074
Total expenditure: £34,752

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 January 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MUKESH VRAJLAL MEHTA Trustee 18 January 2017
None on record
RAJESH HASMUKH MEHTA Trustee 17 January 2017
None on record
MAYUR VRAJLAL MEHTA Trustee 31 December 1991
None on record
SURENDRA VIRCHAND MEHTA Trustee 31 December 1991
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.79k £25.25k £27.26k £25.32k £35.07k
Total expenditure £26.79k £86.03k £124.43k £40.85k £34.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Kipfold
Cheetwood House
Cheetwood Road
Manchester
M8 8AQ
Phone:
01614286425
Website:

No information available