BRITISH MALIGNANT HYPERTHERMIA ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BMHA provides information to individuals and families affected by Malignant Hyperthermia. An emergency Helpline is provided as well as emergency warning discs and cards and translations in several languages. The subscriptions and donations from its members helps to fund research into the problem. Meetings, newsletters, a variety of leaflets, are provided for members as well as a website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 January 1992: Standard registration
- 21 October 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- B M H A (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.09k | £6.77k | £5.96k | £5.98k | £6.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.61k | £2.26k | £3.09k | £4.38k | £5.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 12 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 17 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 18 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1989 AS AMENDED 5 OCTOBER 1991, 21 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF INDIVIDUALS AFFECTED BY MALIGNANT HYPERTHERMIA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window