Accounts and annual returns UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE - YORK

Charity number: 1007843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 18 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 July 2023 06 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 06 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 29 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 18 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window