COMBE BANK EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and provide for the advancement of education and to fund or assist in the funding of education for children and young people in England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 April 1992: Standard registration
- COMBE BANK SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- COMBE BANK SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER HUGH DICKINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paula Hills | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL KEEN | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Marnham | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNE GILBERT | Trustee | 23 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.47k | £54.17k | £63.33k | £77.54k | £71.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £439.53k | £62.11k | £495.96k | £532.66k | £372.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 AUGUST 1972, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 23 JUNE 1997 AND 29 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/12/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO SCHOOLS) AND TO FUND OR ASSIST IN THE FUNDING OF EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ENGLAND
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Haysmacintyre
Thames Exchange
10 Queen Street Place
LONDON
EC4R 1AG
- Phone:
- 02073953000
- Email:
- pholden@haysmacintyre.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window