AUTISM TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established in 1968 the charity is now a leading provider of specialist residential, day services, respite and family support to people with autism, based in Wirral.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£29,965,000
Donations and legacies | £1.19m | |
Charitable activities | £28.67m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £107.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£27,201,000
Raising funds | £91.00k | |
Charitable activities | £27.03m | |
Other | £85.00k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £28,496,000 from 36 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £176.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £27.03m | |
Retained for future use | £2.76m |
People

903 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
- Wrexham
Governance
- 30 January 1992: Standard registration
- AUTISM TOGETHER (Working name)
- WIRRAL AUTISTIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- WIRRAL AUTISTIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- WIRRAL AUTISTIC SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iain Nicholson Cadman | Chair | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carol Corton | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Whiteside | Trustee | 26 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Brealey | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Rebecca Sansome | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Leech | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carys Hannah Ward | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nuala Marie Kennedy | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Smart | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Carole Anne Forrester Battersby | Trustee | 24 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edward Behan | Trustee | 24 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.87m | £23.68m | £24.52m | £25.09m | £29.97m | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.14m | £22.80m | £23.82m | £25.34m | £27.20m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £22.41m | £22.91m | £23.63m | £24.64m | £28.50m | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.60k | £576.00k | £559.00k | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £226.00k | £676.00k | £781.00k | £309.00k | £1.19m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £22.64m | £23.00m | £23.74m | £24.77m | £28.67m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £14.00k | £107.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £23.04m | £22.65m | £23.71m | £25.24m | £27.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £96.00k | £100.00k | £64.00k | £73.00k | £91.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £74.00k | £52.00k | £47.00k | £101.00k | £119.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £47.00k | £39.00k | £20.00k | £85.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.62m | £5.66m | £5.43m | £5.24m | £5.48m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.20m | £3.96m | £5.10m | £5.61m | £9.20m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.17m | -£2.93m | -£1.19m | £1.43m | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.28m | £2.71m | £2.22m | £2.13m | £1.78m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/03/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP SERVICES FOR THE WELFARE, CARE, TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF THOSE CHILDREN, ADOLESCENTS AND ADULTS VARIOUSLY DIAGNOSED AS AUTISTIC, OR AS HAVING AUTISTIC TENDENCIES OR TRAITS, OR ASPERGER'S SYNDROME, WHETHER OR NOT THESE CONDITIONS ARE ASSOCIATED WITH OTHER CONDITIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Autism Together
Oak House
Unit C
6 Tebay Road
Bromborough
WIRRAL
- Phone:
- 01513347510
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window