PRINT QUARTERLY PUBLICATIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is the advancement, promotion and encouragement of education and research in the field of art history and the contemporary arts, in particular in the medium of prints. The dissemination of the results of such research will primarily be achieved through the publication of the Print Quarterly magazine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 January 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR DAVID BINDMAN | Trustee | 01 May 2002 |
|
|||||||
David Landau | Trustee | 10 January 1992 |
|
|||||||
JANE MARTINEAU | Trustee | 10 January 1992 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID ALEXANDER | Trustee | 10 January 1992 |
|
|
||||||
Professor ANTONY GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 10 January 1992 |
|
|
||||||
DR NICOLAS JOHN BARKER OBE | Trustee | 10 January 1992 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £324.41k | £118.30k | £162.51k | £314.08k | £192.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.64k | £195.31k | £204.26k | £192.98k | £237.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
(A) EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF ART HISTORY AND THE CONTEMPORARY ARTS IN PARTICULAR IN THE MEDIUM OF PRINTS AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PUBLICATION OF PRINT QUARTERLY OR OTHER PUBLICATIONS (B) OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 CHESTER ROW
LONDON
SW1W 9JH
- Phone:
- 02072590952
- Email:
- admin@printquarterly.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window