THE VOLUNTEER BUREAU OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recruitment, training and placing volunteers. Volunteering information and exchange forum. Publish directory of volunteering opportunities. Young persons project offering opportunities in work experience. Registered body providing CRB service for borough. Organise Get Together Groups throughout Barking and Dagenham for isolated and older residents serviced and managed by volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
People

3 Trustee(s)
720 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 February 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Morleen Nyirenda-Okolonji | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ZAHRA IBRAHIM | Trustee | 13 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER HAWES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.74k | £46.04k | £59.03k | £66.52k | £48.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.37k | £53.80k | £48.84k | £65.38k | £40.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
0CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND DECEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO UNDERTAKE VOLUNTARY WORK IN EDUCATION, SOCIAL SERVICES, AND SIMILAR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AMONGST THOSE CLASSES IN NEED.
Area of benefit
LONDON BUREAU OF BARKING AND DAGENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
STARTING POINT
16 Pickering Road
BARKING
IG11 8PG
- Phone:
- 02032882160
- Email:
- JEBRANDON30@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window