FRIENDS OF LANGER SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Run fayres, disco's, raffles, to raise money to help with projects within school life, example help towards school trips, buy new equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 17 February 1992: Standard registration
- FOLSA (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Esther Ruffles | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Garnham | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Field | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anderson | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/11/2020 | 03/11/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £569 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 16 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 August 2024 | 387 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 November 2021 | 11 June 2024 | 647 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 November 2020 | 11 June 2024 | 1012 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY)
Area of benefit
FELIXSTOWE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOLSA
Langer Primary Academy
Langer Road
FELIXSTOWE
Suffolk
IP11 2HL
- Phone:
- 01394283065
- Email:
- FOLSA@LANGER.ORG.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window