Financial history KINGSWOOD EQUESTRIAN TRUST

Charity number: 1008081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £102.51k £110.87k £94.58k £77.42k £92.06k
Total expenditure £106.59k £102.27k £98.43k £78.92k £91.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £53.65k £18.70k N/A N/A