KINGSWOOD EQUESTRIAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of equestrian sport for the purpose of sport and physical recreation. Promotion of equestrian training to disadvantaged, minority and youth groups. Equestrian education though demonstrations, clinics or training seminars. Provision of sanctuary facilities and care for retired equines.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 February 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT JOHN LICKLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GEMMA LOUISE GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 22 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.51k | £110.87k | £94.58k | £77.42k | £92.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.59k | £102.27k | £98.43k | £78.92k | £91.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.65k | £18.70k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 March 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 March 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF UNDERPRIVILEDGED AND DISABLED CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF A WORKING RETIREMENT HOME FOR HORSES AND PONIES AIMED AT UTILISING SUCH HORSES AND PONIES IN ORDER TO PROVIDE RIDING AND OTHER EQUESTRIAN TRAINING FOR THE SAID UNDERPRIVILEDGED AND DISABLED CHILDREN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGSWOOD LODGE
COUNTY LANE
ALBRIGHTON
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV7 3AH
- Phone:
- 01902374480
- Email:
- support@kingswoodec.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window