CHRISTIAN CONCERN FOR ONE WORLD

Charity number: 1008146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are an ecumenical charity working on global issues, particularly those embodied in the Millenium Development Goals. We work by linking people to resources, networks and accurate, up-to-date information in order to foster Christian responsibility worldwide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £26,326
Total expenditure: £29,533

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Oxfordshire
  • Reading
  • Slough
  • West Berkshire
  • Windsor And Maidenhead
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • C C O W (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julia Muriel McLaren Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Keith William Whyte Trustee 01 March 2014
None on record
CATRIONA MARGARET CAPPLEMAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.10k £32.86k £23.74k £29.71k £26.33k
Total expenditure £23.23k £24.55k £27.59k £26.98k £29.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Rectory
Church End
Blewbury
DIDCOT
OX11 9QH
Phone:
01235851763