THE ZAMBIA SOCIETY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Objects of the Trust are to help the poor, especially orphans, promote better health, education and the acquisition of skills in Zambia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Zambia
Governance
- 13 February 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy John Legge | Chair | 09 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Tembo | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Clare Ann Morris | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Melville Hunter | Trustee | 18 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David William Nicholls | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Diana Heath Hobson | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRETTA BLANCHE HUDSON | Trustee | 18 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MATHIAS MACKSON MBEWE | Trustee | 11 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNE FRAENKEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW SIMON ROSE FCA CF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Eileen Margaret Hamilton | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN MIDDLETON BARNARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEN HAMILTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELISABETH ANN SHEPHERDSON YOUNG MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.32k | £42.95k | £66.34k | £56.77k | £123.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.33k | £42.81k | £71.90k | £54.52k | £53.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH. NOVEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED 20 MAY 1997
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS TO PREVENT DISEASE AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ZAMBIA.
Area of benefit
ZAMBIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Featherstone Grove
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 5RF
- Phone:
- 07498 984621
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window