R B GRAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Benefiting charities established to provide relief for persons suffering from cancer, disease of the heart, leukaemia, athritis or rheumatism, and charities established for the conduct of research into these illnesses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 February 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MARSDEN FAIRFOOT | Trustee | 23 February 2001 |
|
|||||
MR MICHAEL GRAY | Trustee | 24 January 1992 |
|
|
||||
JANET ELIZABETH FAIRFOOT | Trustee | 24 January 1992 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.22k | £20.90k | £22.12k | £24.67k | £26.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.65k | £24.49k | £26.30k | £24.88k | £24.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 December 2024 | 309 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 April 2022 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT OF CHARITIES ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER, DISEASES OF THE HEART, LEUKAEMIA, ARTHRITIS OR RHEUMATISM, OR THE SUPPORT OF CHARITIES ESTABLISHED FOR THE CONDUCT OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, TREATMENT AND CURE OF ANY OF SUCH CONDITIONS. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
STONEYBECK
ROWDEN LANE
HAMPSTHWAITE
HARROGATE
HG3 2ER
- Phone:
- 07801569368
- Email:
- janetfairfoot@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window