THE HARBOUR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Harbour provides a professional counselling and psychotherapy service to people affected by physical life-threatening illness. This includes adults who are ill themselves; carers and family members; and people recently bereaved due to illness. The therapy explores the impact of life-threatening illness and gives clients time to think about their fears and concerns.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £64,373 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 February 1992: Standard registration
- THE RED ADMIRAL PROJECT(BRISTOL) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lily Eastwood | Chair | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Yevko | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justine Williams | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Millington | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Darrall | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £217.44k | £270.03k | £277.32k | £242.22k | £212.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £260.18k | £233.83k | £240.79k | £227.71k | £250.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £10.85k | £15.82k | £62.45k | £64.37k | |
|
Income from government grants | £58.26k | £81.60k | £58.26k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH. JANUARY 1992 AND AMENDED 20TH JULY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE SUFFERING FROM OR AFFECTED BY THE DISEASES OR CONDITION KNOWN AS OR APPARENTLY RELATED TO HIV OR AIDS AND THOSE AFFECTED BY OTHER TERMINAL ILLNESSES
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Harbour
30 Frogmore Street
BRISTOL
BS1 5NA
- Phone:
- 01179259348
- Email:
- info@the-harbour.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window