BROOKE ROBINSON MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To administer and display the art collection of Brooke Robinson (1836-1911) currently housed within Dudley Museum & Art Gallery. The collection includes 17th, 18th and 19th century paintings, furniture, ceramics, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dudley
Governance
- 17 February 1992: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET WALKER | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|||
Brendan Martin Clifford | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|||
COLIN VICTOR KNIPE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.97k | £13.41k | £15.53k | £19.27k | £21.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.59k | £3.40k | £3.42k | £3.44k | £3.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 1911 AND SCHEMES DATED 31 DECEMBER 1918 AND 20 JULY 1982
Charitable objects
1. A MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DUDLEY AND THE PUBLIC GENERALLY. 2. AN EXHIBITS ENDOWMENT FUND FOR THE RENEWAL OR ADDITION TO THE EXHIBITS.
Area of benefit
DUDLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 PRIORY CLOSE
DUDLEY
DY1 3ED
- Phone:
- 01384254459
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window