Financial history ROYAL LANCASHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1008403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £235.92k £1.28k £346.42k £392.16k £340.37k
Total expenditure £238.47k £11.83k £249.96k £307.89k £342.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A