Financial history CHURCH-IN-THE-FIELD CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1008533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.97k £582 £1.19k £2.49k £2.28k
Total expenditure £4.27k £0 £72 £388 £9.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A