Trustees CHILDREN'S SCRAPSTORE
Charity Number: 1008788

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eleanor Kate James | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Elizabeth Baker | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie Corinna Roberts | Trustee | 07 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ford | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alban Forster | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jaeckle | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Pendlington | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA JANE COLLIER | Trustee | 05 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
VENETIA SHAH-DYAN | Trustee | 05 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE JANE CASSWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.