STOCKWELL COLLEGE TRUST FUND - THE KERNOW BEQUEST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awards donations to suitable bodies from the funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 28 February 1992: Standard registration
- 17 December 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- STOCKWELL COLLEGE TRUST FUND:THE KERNOW BEQUEST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £361 | £327 | £472 | £439 | £10 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £0 | £53 | £43 | £16.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 10 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 28 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 25 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 15 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 17 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27TH. NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE WORK OF ANY INSTITUTION PERPETUATING THE WORK OF STOCKWELL COLLEGE IN THE TRAINING OF TEACHERS, THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS,FOLIOS,RECORDS,TAPE RECORDINGS AND FILMS OF EDUCATIONAL AND AESTHETIC VALUE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window