Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF HUNSDON SCHOOL

Charity number: 1008871
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 September 2024 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 July 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 July 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 November 2020 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required