RAINBOW PRE SCHOOL (STOKE POGES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre school for children age between 2-5 years old
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 28 February 1992: Standard registration
- 23 December 2021: Funds received from 1170473 CIPPENHAM BAPTIST PRESCHOOL
- RAINBOW PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- RAINBOW PLAYGROUP (STOKE POGES, WEXHAM) (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEAH WILSON | Chair | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
LORNA DULAN | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA LOCKIE | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANUSHKA ARYA | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Sanders | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Baljinder Sandhu | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amandeep Purewal | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.70k | £57.42k | £98.64k | £96.81k | £79.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.30k | £80.61k | £75.32k | £93.10k | £79.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £43.17k | £56.81k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.06k | £11.45k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH. SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED ON 04/02/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE BY (A) PROVIDING SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY, IN WHICH PARENTS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART (B) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN (C) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUPS ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
STOKE POGES AND WEXHAM, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WALTER DAVIES SCOUTING CENTRE
DUFFIELD LANE
STOKE POGES
BUCKS
SL2 4AL
- Phone:
- 01753647572
- Email:
- rainbow.accounts@live.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window