Accounts and annual returns RICKMANSWORTH PARK SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1008967
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 August 2024 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 July 2023 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 September 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required