Trustees THE HAYWARDS HEATH AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity Number: 1008994
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carole Andrews | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eric Harvey Whitaker | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Amanda Trevitt | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Louis Gee | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MORRISON | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Metherell | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Howard Roe | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Roberts | Trustee | 07 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ERIC BASSETT | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Caddy | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNE BETTY ROBERTS | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.