LEUCAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LEUCAN embraces families living in the area from Shoreham to Chichester with children with leukaemia, cancer or bone marrow failure. The self-help group offers comfort, support and advice, along with financial assistance to families who have unexpected expenses and travel costs. The group also organises social events to enable families to meet in informal situations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 February 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR I D CAMBURN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £3.00k | £3.00k | £3.80k | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.39k | £153 | £364 | £750 | £1.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
(A)TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE(IN SO FAR AS MAY BE CHARITABLE IN LAW) OF:-(1)CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM LEUKAEMIA AND OTHER CANCERS. (2)THE FAMILIES OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS. (3)THE FAMILIES WHO HAVE RECENTLY LOST A CHILD OR CHILDREN THROUGH LEUKAEMIA OR OTHER CANCERS.
Area of benefit
CHICHESTER, SHOREHAM, WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
BAYTREE HOUSE
LYMINSTER ROAD
LYMINSTER
LITTLEHAMPTON
BN17 7QF
- Phone:
- 01903884955
- Email:
- ian.camburn@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window