RITUAL ART
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 March 1992: Standard registration
- 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- RITUAL THEATRE ARTS IN EDUCATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 19 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 11 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27TH FEBRUARY 1991, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 14TH FEBRUARY 1992 AND AMENDED 19 APRIL 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN DRAMA, DANCE AND OTHER VISUAL ARTS, IN PARTICULAR VISUAL ARTS OF AFRICAN ORIGIN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window