Accounts and annual returns STOCKTON HEATH PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1009295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 07 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 07 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 16 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 08 September 2020 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 31 March 2021 304 days late Download Open in new window