KILBURN IRISH YOUTH PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Brent
Governance
- 05 March 1992: Standard registration
- 14 July 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN LONDON IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE IRISH OR OF IRISH DESCENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID YOUNG PEOPLE. (B)TO ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A YOUTH CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR ANY OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (C)TO RELIEVE YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS OF MONEY TO SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window