EAST MIDLANDS MUSEUMS SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regional museum network supporting members to serve their communities and working in partnership with regional agencies. Activities include: networking; meetings; communications; training courses; emergency/disaster support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 10 March 1992: Standard registration
- 17 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EMMS (Working name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.76k | £130.24k | £87.09k | £29.30k | £882 | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.28k | £129.18k | £82.76k | £49.15k | £165 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 02 August 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 26 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 12 November 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 OCTOBER 1996 AND 26 OCTOBER 2001 AND 4TH NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO MUSEUMS AND ART GALLERIES IN THE EAST MIDLANDS REGION AS DEFINED IN SCHEDULE 1 OF THE REGIONAL DEVELOPMENT AGENCIES ACT 1998) AND TO PROMOTE THEIR DEVELOPMENT AND THEIR BETTER USE AND ENJOYMENT BY THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
EAST MIDLANDS: DERBYSHIRE, LEICESTERSHIRE,LINCOLNSHIRE, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE. NON-METROPOLITAN DISTRICTS OF DERBY, LEICESTER, NOTTINGHAM AND RUTLAND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window