Accounts and annual returns WALSALL BLACK SISTERS COLLECTIVE

Charity Number: 1009687
Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 February 2023 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 February 2023 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window