Financial history THE MINTO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1009690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £12.28k £140.74k £19.57k £12.09k £14.27k
Total expenditure £13.00k £1.15k £14.11k £10.08k £25.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A