Trustees ASSOCIATION OF NATURAL MEDICINES LIMITED
Charity number: 1009714

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tuleena Barrow | Chair | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sunil Chhatre | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Morgan | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Morgan | Trustee | 13 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA BRUNTON | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caryce Smith | Trustee | 19 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Brunton | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVE DARNEY | Trustee | 19 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JARVIS | Trustee | 18 October 2006 |
|
|
||||
DR NELSON BRUNTON | Trustee | 11 March 1992 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.