THE MRS SMITH AND MOUNT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funding Mental Health, Homelessness and Health in the Community. Appeals are considered for project costs, running costs or salaries. Applications for funding for refurbishments/alterations to bring a building up to standard to meet legislative requirements may be considered. Exclusions apply - please see our website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Kent
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 March 1992: Standard registration
- THE MRS SMITH & MOUNT TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIMOTHY BUCKLAND WARREN | Chair | 13 November 2013 |
|
|||||||
Serena Mullings | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Elizabeth McKenzie | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
SEAN WILLIAM SHEPLEY | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.41k | £225.59k | £150.29k | £160.27k | £187.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £464.16k | £363.49k | £459.97k | £513.83k | £777.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 TRULL FARM BUILDINGS
TETBURY
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL8 8SQ
- Phone:
- 01285841900
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window