HERITAGE CONSERVATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides grants for: The conservation, maintenance and restoration of heritage property Educational, access and training initiatives in and about historic houses and gardens Research projects linked closely to the conservation of the historic or artistic contents of houses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 March 1992: Standard registration
- 03 September 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 03 September 2019: Funds transferred to 1111049 Historic Houses Foundation
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.92k | £34.87k | £5.74k | £46.59k | £12.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.07k | £18.90k | £33.26k | £13.73k | £8.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 02 February 2018 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 02 February 2018 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29/06/1990 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05/12/1991 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 16/05/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO CONSERVE MAINTAIN AND RESTORE ANY HERITAGE PROPERTY FOR THE EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC 2) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONNECTED WITH HERITAGE PROPERTY 3) TO FOSTER THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND KNOWLEDGE AND THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF ARTS AND SCIENCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE U.K.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window