LEVEN C E SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding various fundraising activities throughout the year within the school environment. Such activities include: Christmas and Summer Fairs, Race Nights, School Discos, Family Fun Nights and serving refreshments at school organised events like sports day and school productions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 12 March 1992: Standard registration
- LEVEN C/E SCHOOL P T F A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauren Warnett | Chair | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Carlisle | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Hall | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.80k | £3.92k | £2.79k | £6.32k | £8.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.09k | £4.85k | £1.55k | £3.97k | £4.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 OCTOBER 1977
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
SCHOOL CATCHMENT AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEVEN C OF E SCHOOL
SOUTH STREET
LEVEN
BEVERLEY
HU17 5NX
- Phone:
- 01964542474
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window